Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0254
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0461)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0049 (HB0207/CH0050)
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 (HB0405)
Title
Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0207 /CH0050 (SB0140/CH0049) St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0246 /CH0254 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0405 (SB0461) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0140 /CH0049 (HB0207/CH0050) St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0461 (HB0405) Plumbing and Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Inspectors - Qualifications Senator Conway 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM