Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0343
Title
Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 /CH0539
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665
Title
Baltimore City – Department of Public Works – Frozen–Pipe Prevention Rebate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0705
Title
Environment – Graywater – Residential Use
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0343 Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 /CH0539 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 103-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0665 Baltimore City – Department of Public Works – Frozen–Pipe Prevention Rebate Program Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0705 Environment – Graywater – Residential Use Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page