Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Plumbing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0386)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0138
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0058)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0386) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 /CH0138 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 138
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
SB0386 (HB0058) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:27 PM