Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 (SB0162/CH0140)
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Podiatrists - Scope of Practice and Hospital Privileges
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0380/CH0056)
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Cease and Desist Orders and Fines
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 /CH0140 (HB0272)
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Podiatrists - Scope of Practice and Hospital Privileges
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 /CH0056 (HB0302)
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Cease and Desist Orders and Fines
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 (SB0162/CH0140) Health Occupations - Licensed Podiatrists - Scope of Practice and Hospital Privileges Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0302 (SB0380/CH0056) State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Cease and Desist Orders and Fines Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing Education Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0162 /CH0140 (HB0272) Health Occupations - Licensed Podiatrists - Scope of Practice and Hospital Privileges Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 /CH0056 (HB0302) State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Cease and Desist Orders and Fines Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM