Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0187 (SB0304/CH0188)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072
Title
Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 /CH0188 (HB0378/CH0187)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0378 /CH0187 (SB0304/CH0188) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0428 Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1072 Prince George's County - County Income Tax - Credit for Primary and Specialty Health Care Providers Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1586 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Appointments Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0304 /CH0188 (HB0378/CH0187) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:51 PM