Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 /CH0673 (SB0721)
Title
Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's County
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 (SB0590)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294)
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1178)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721 (HB1175/CH0673)
Title
Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's County
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1056 Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and Awareness Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 /CH0673 (SB0721) Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's County Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1178 (SB0590) Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of Sunset Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294) Firearm Safety Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0590 (HB1178) Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of Sunset Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 (HB1175/CH0673) Police Training Commission - Membership - Police Chiefs' Association of Prince George's County Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM