Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0520 (SB0147)
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Baltimore County Police Officers - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Criminal Procedure - Execution of a Search Warrant - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 (SB0589)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585
Title
Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Policies and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 (SB0233/CH0542)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016 /CH0519
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements - Mental Health Issues
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371 /CH0651
Title
Criminal Law - Strangulation - Lethality Screening Protocol and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466
Title
Task Force to Study Restorative Justice Discipline Practices in Maryland Public Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Public Safety - Police Officer Certification Applicant - Prior Marijuana Use
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 /CH0542 (HB0785)
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0521)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810
Title
Marlow Heights Police Department - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0520 (SB0147) Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training Oversight Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 Baltimore County Police Officers - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0292 Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 /CH0619 (SB0161/CH0658) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0491 Criminal Procedure - Execution of a Search Warrant - Reimbursement Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0521 (SB0589) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0585 Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Policies and Reporting Requirements Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0785 (SB0233/CH0542) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Delegate Anderson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0856 State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1016 /CH0519 Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1188 Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements - Mental Health Issues Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1296 Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 /CH0651 Criminal Law - Strangulation - Lethality Screening Protocol and Training Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 Task Force to Study Restorative Justice Discipline Practices in Maryland Public Schools Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1560 Public Safety - Police Officer Certification Applicant - Prior Marijuana Use Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Hough 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 /CH0542 (HB0785) Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0521) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 Marlow Heights Police Department - Establishment Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1026 Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations President 6 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM