Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Assessments of Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908
Title
Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency Status
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 /CH0702
Title
Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0644 (SB0220/CH0645)
Title
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0309
Title
Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0409)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0645 (HB1279/CH0644)
Title
Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB1403)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control Devices Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0213 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0899 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Assessments of Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency Status Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 /CH0702 Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 /CH0644 (SB0220/CH0645) Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1285 Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Beidle)
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 /CH0309 Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 (SB0409) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 /CH0645 (HB1279/CH0644) Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 (HB1403) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM