Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024 /CH0758
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 /CH0671
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Medical Cannabis Program Training
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 (SB0582)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805
Title
Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0705)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0343)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police Force
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526 (SB0344)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638 (SB0788)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1803 (SB1241)
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 (HB1169)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB1526)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB0522)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0920)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1638)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013
Title
First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1241 (HB1803)
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 /CH0758 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0190 /CH0671 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Consultation and Evaluation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0265 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Medical Cannabis Program Training Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 (SB0582) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 Task Force on Police Staffing Levels in Baltimore City Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 (SB0705) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 (SB0343) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1175 Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police Force Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1526 (SB0344) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1638 (SB0788) Public Information Act - Revisions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1803 (SB1241) Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 (HB1169) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 (HB1526) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0582 (HB0522) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Sexual Assault Investigation Training Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0920) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB1638) Public Information Act - Revisions Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1013 First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1241 (HB1803) Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM