Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Police Training and Standards Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0094
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 /CH0489 (SB0853/CH0490)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 (SB0539)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 (SB0666)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0779)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011 (SB1037)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers - Medical Cannabis Employment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210 (SB0815)
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 (SB0971)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0462)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0760)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0649)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717
Title
Independent Institutions of Higher Education – Police Force
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0839)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB1210)
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0490 (HB0433/CH0489)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0098
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB1342)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1011)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0370 /CH0094 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0433 /CH0489 (SB0853/CH0490) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0462 (SB0539) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 (SB0666) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0566) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0779) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0927 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission – Training Requirements – Firearms Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB1011 (SB1037) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Requirements Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers - Medical Cannabis Employment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1210 (SB0815) Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1342 (SB0971) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0539 (HB0462) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0760) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0649) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0717 Independent Institutions of Higher Education – Police Force Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0779 (HB0839) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0815 (HB1210) Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
SB0853 /CH0490 (HB0433/CH0489) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0098 Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0971 (HB1342) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1037 (HB1011) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Uniform Citizen Complaint Process (Anton's Law) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM