Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Police Training and Standards Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Law Enforcement - Department of State Police - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0899)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB0479)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0237 (SB0633/CH0238)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0345 (SB0347/CH0346)
Title
Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012 (SB0812)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 (SB1066)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 /CH0426
Title
Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456
Title
Law Enforcement Agencies - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470 (SB0454)
Title
First Responders - Mandatory Mental Health Training
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321
Title
Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0346 (HB0857/CH0345)
Title
Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB1470)
Title
Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0479)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Use of Handcuffs - Body Attachments Policy
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 /CH0238 (HB0541/CH0237)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB1012)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 (HB0239)
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB1090)
Title
Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 Law Enforcement - Department of State Police - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0239 (SB0899) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0479 (SB0479) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 /CH0237 (SB0633/CH0238) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes Delegate Lopez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 237
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 /CH0345 (SB0347/CH0346) Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1012 (SB0812) Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 (SB1066) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1111 /CH0426 Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1137 Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1456 Law Enforcement Agencies - Reporting Requirements Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1470 (SB0454) First Responders - Mandatory Mental Health Training Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0347 /CH0346 (HB0857/CH0345) Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 346
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0454 (HB1470) Public Safety – Mandatory Mental Health Training – First Responders and Law Enforcement Officers Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0479 (HB0479) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0563 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Use of Handcuffs - Body Attachments Policy Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0633 /CH0238 (HB0541/CH0237) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 238
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0698 Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0812 (HB1012) Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0899 (HB0239) Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Body-Worn Camera Policy Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1066 (HB1090) Law Enforcement – Complaints and Investigations and Use of Force (Anton’s Law) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:17 PM