Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Police Training and Standards Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152
Title
Law Enforcement – Department of State Police – Body–Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188
Title
No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0589)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 (SB0136)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445 (SB0671)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Police Reform and Accountability Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Public Information Act – Personnel and Investigatory Records – Complaints Against Police Officers
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0583)
Title
Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Police Qualified Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Law Enforcement Performance Measurements - Required Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063
Title
Marlow Heights Police Department - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 (HB0315)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
No-Knock Warrants - Elimination
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 (HB0727)
Title
Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Creditability of Witnesses and Misconduct Database (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0197)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0445)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 Law Enforcement – Department of State Police – Body–Worn Cameras Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0187 Public Safety – Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0188 No–Knock Warrants – Elimination (Duncan’s Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0194 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers and Public Defenders - Implicit Bias - Testing, Training, and Evaluation Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0197 (SB0589) Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0241 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0315 (SB0136) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0445 (SB0671) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0670 Police Reform and Accountability Act of 2021 Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0671 Public Information Act – Personnel and Investigatory Records – Complaints Against Police Officers Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0727 (SB0583) Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1049 Police Qualified Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1286 Law Enforcement Performance Measurements - Required Reporting Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0042 Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0050 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0063 Marlow Heights Police Department - Establishment Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 (HB0315) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Interrogation Protection Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0419 No-Knock Warrants - Elimination Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0583 (HB0727) Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 Law Enforcement Officers - Creditability of Witnesses and Misconduct Database (Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0197) Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0445) Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page