Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073
Title
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections - Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 (SB0327)
Title
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907
Title
Electronic Voting System Devices - Ballot Arrangement
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0584)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 (HB0515)
Title
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453
Title
Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583
Title
Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1044)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1397)
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 Election Law - Primary Elections - Dates Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0515 (SB0327) Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0907 Electronic Voting System Devices - Ballot Arrangement Delegate Kach 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1044 (SB0584) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1234 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of Names Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0294 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0327 (HB0515) Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB1044) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0729 /CH0310 Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of Election Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1065 (HB1397) Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement Senator Raskin 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM