Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0691)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0103
Title
Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0032
Title
Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education Member - Limitation on Candidacy for Other Elective Office
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0418)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0418 (SB0691) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB0562 Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0103 Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of Elections Delegate Summers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0942 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0109 /CH0032 Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Electronic Filing Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Anne Arundel County - Board of Education Member - Limitation on Candidacy for Other Elective Office Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (15-28)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0418) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1043 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM