Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0271)
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 /CH0312 (SB0593)
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0166)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0318
Title
Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0604)
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Election Law - Deadline Date for Withdrawal of Certificate of Candidacy
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0239)
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0085 Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0239 (SB0271) Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0373 Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential Areas Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Delegate Turner 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0400 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 /CH0312 (SB0593) Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0604 (SB0166) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0005 /CH0318 Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0604) General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 Election Law - Deadline Date for Withdrawal of Certificate of Candidacy Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0239) Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM