Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 (SB0415)
Title
Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481
Title
Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 (SB0416)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544
Title
Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0117
Title
Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0632)
Title
Election Law - Postelection Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332
Title
Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 (HB0424)
Title
Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0536)
Title
Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 (HB0761)
Title
Election Law – Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Election Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0335 Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0424 (SB0415) Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0481 Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0515 Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0536 (SB0416) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0544 Presidential Elections - Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote - Repeal Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0738 /CH0117 Election Law - Certificates of Candidacy and Ballot Questions - Revisions Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 (SB0632) Election Law - Postelection Procedures Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0767 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1037 Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1058 Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0332 Campaign Finance - For-Profit Substance Abuse and Mental Health Treatment Providers - Disclosure of Contributions Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0415 (HB0424) Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0416 (HB0536) Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0632 (HB0761) Election Law – Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0831 Election Reform Act of 2021 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page