Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB0895/CH0572)
Title
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Harford County Republican Central Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319
Title
Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 /CH0572 (HB1479)
Title
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies
Sponsor
Minority Leader
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 /CH0074
Title
Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance Reports
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1043
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1022 Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 (SB0895/CH0572) Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies Delegate Frank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1513 Harford County Republican Central Committee - Membership Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0319 Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 /CH0572 (HB1479) Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies Minority Leader 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 /CH0074 Election Law - Filing Deadlines for Pre-Primary Election and Post-General Election Campaign Finance Reports Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1043 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive Status Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM