Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0252
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 /CH0203 (SB0408/CH0202)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0380)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578 (SB0002)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0578)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0458)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 /CH0202 (HB0241/CH0203)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669
Title
Republican Party Central Committee Members - Tenure in Office - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 /CH0252 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 /CH0203 (SB0408/CH0202) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0458 (SB0380) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 (SB0002) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 (HB0578) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0290 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 (HB0458) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 /CH0202 (HB0241/CH0203) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 Republican Party Central Committee Members - Tenure in Office - Revision Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM