Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0155
Title
Election Law – Candidates – Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208
Title
Campaign Finance - Death of Elected Official - Transfer of Funds to Slate Account
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Campaign Finance - Campaign Committee of Deceased Elected Official - Transfer to Appointed Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784
Title
Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 /CH0376
Title
County Public Campaign Financing – Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014
Title
Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Campaign Finance - Prohibition of Video Lottery Contributions - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0042
Title
Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385
Title
Election Law - Primary Elections - Voting by Unaffiliated Voters
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 (HB0147)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Boards of Education
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 /CH0491
Title
Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Campaign Finance - Out-of-State Political Committees
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 /CH0155 Election Law – Candidates – Revisions Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0208 Campaign Finance - Death of Elected Official - Transfer of Funds to Slate Account Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 Campaign Finance - Campaign Committee of Deceased Elected Official - Transfer to Appointed Spouse Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0227 Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 /CH0376 County Public Campaign Financing – Administration Delegate Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1014 Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1321 Campaign Finance - Prohibition of Video Lottery Contributions - Repeal Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0230 /CH0042 Election Law - Canvassing of Absentee Ballots - Reporting Unofficial Results Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 Election Law - Primary Elections - Voting by Unaffiliated Voters Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 (HB0147) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Boards of Education Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0950 /CH0491 Campaign Finance – Termination of Campaign Finance Entities Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Campaign Finance - Out-of-State Political Committees Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM