Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022
Title
Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375
Title
Campaign Finance Entities - Officers - Repeal of Voter Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Responsible Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Campaign Finance - Death of Elected Official - Transfer of Funds to Slate Account
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 (SB0537/CH0563)
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0613)
Title
Public Financing Act – Candidate and Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0010
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 /CH0563 (HB0701)
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB1125)
Title
Public Financing Act – Candidate and Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/16/2020 - 1:30 PM
HB0375 Campaign Finance Entities - Officers - Repeal of Voter Registration Requirement Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Responsible Officers Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0538 Campaign Finance - Revisions Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0567 Campaign Finance - Death of Elected Official - Transfer of Funds to Slate Account Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 (SB0537/CH0563) General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts Delegate Dumais 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0871 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 (SB0613) Public Financing Act – Candidate and Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0010 Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 /CH0563 (HB0701) General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts Senator Edwards 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/18/2020 - 9:00 AM
SB0613 (HB1125) Public Financing Act – Candidate and Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act) Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0648 Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Lam)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:15 PM