Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0691)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 (SB0645)
Title
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political Parties
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB0895/CH0572)
Title
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Harford County Republican Central Committee - Membership
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 /CH0047
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319
Title
Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1071)
Title
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political Parties
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0418)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 /CH0572 (HB1479)
Title
Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies
Sponsor
Minority Leader
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032
Title
Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0418 (SB0691) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB1022 Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 (SB0645) State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political Parties Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required Information Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1479 (SB0895/CH0572) Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies Delegate Frank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1513 Harford County Republican Central Committee - Membership Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0243 /CH0047 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB1071) State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political Parties Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0691 (HB0418) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 /CH0572 (HB1479) Election Law - Baltimore City Republican Party Central Committee - Filling of Vacancies Minority Leader 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM