Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0518)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626
Title
Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership PG 315-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0318
Title
Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0573)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Delegate Turner 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0573 (SB0518) Fair Elections Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0906 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership PG 315-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Between Candidates and Outside Spending Organizations Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 /CH0318 Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0573) Fair Elections Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0519 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by Governor Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM