Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022
Title
Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Election Law – Campaign Material – Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0266)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0284)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration List Maintenance - Reporting (Voter Registration Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431 (SB0967)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0010
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0341)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0346)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Prince George's County - Appointment of Board of License Commissioners - Legislative Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1431)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/16/2020 - 1:30 PM
HB0198 Election Law - Online Campaign Material - Use of Deepfakes Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0199 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0216 Election Law – Campaign Material – Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0341 (SB0266) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0346 (SB0284) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0538 Campaign Finance - Revisions Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0873 Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1244 Election Law - Voter Registration List Maintenance - Reporting (Voter Registration Security Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1431 (SB0967) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1460 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1495 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0010 Election Law - Special Elections - Calendar Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0341) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0346) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Election Law - County Central Committees - Democratic Party Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Lam)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0729 Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 Prince George's County - Appointment of Board of License Commissioners - Legislative Oversight Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 (HB1431) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 11:31 AM