Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pollution -see also- Sediment Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026 (SB0133)
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0187/CH0010)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0768 (SB0290/CH0008)
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939
Title
Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1826
Title
Environment - Water Pollution Control - Water Quality Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0133 (HB0026)
Title
Community Healthy Air Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0008 (HB0230/CH0768)
Title
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 (SB0133) Community Healthy Air Act Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0161 (SB0187/CH0010) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0230 /CH0768 (SB0290/CH0008) Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Economic Matters
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0458 Environment – Sale or Transfer of Home With On–Site Sewage Disposal System – Nitrogen Removal Technology Requirement Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 Regional Carbon Cost Collection Initiative Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1055 State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018) Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1826 Environment - Water Pollution Control - Water Quality Certification Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0133 (HB0026) Community Healthy Air Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0290 /CH0008 (HB0230/CH0768) Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act) Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM