Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0583
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064
Title
Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0674)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB0858)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Task Force to Study Computer Crimes Against Children and Child Pornography Crimes in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0583 Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without Consent Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit Images Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - Penalties Charles County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0674) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 (HB0858) Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 Task Force to Study Computer Crimes Against Children and Child Pornography Crimes in Maryland Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM