Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Criminal Law - Display of Material Harmful to Minors - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0610
Title
Department of State Police - Investigation Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456
Title
Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551)
Title
Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Criminal Law - Display of Material Harmful to Minors - Restrictions Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0076 /CH0610 Department of State Police - Investigation Authority Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0551 (SB0346/CH0550) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1375 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 /CH0550 (HB0314/CH0551) Peace Orders - Grounds for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM