Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0328 (SB0121/CH0501)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0800)
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Exposure to Pornography - Public Health Crisis
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0009 (SJ0001)
Title
Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public Health
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 /CH0501 (HB0328)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585
Title
Devices Capable of Accessing Content on the Internet - Blocking Capability (Human Trafficking Prevention Act for Maryland)
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0365
Title
Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1134)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 (HJ0009)
Title
Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public Health
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Family Law – Domestic Violence – Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0328 (SB0121/CH0501) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 (SB0800) Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0005 Exposure to Pornography - Public Health Crisis Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
HJ0009 (SJ0001) Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public Health Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0121 /CH0501 (HB0328) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 Devices Capable of Accessing Content on the Internet - Blocking Capability (Human Trafficking Prevention Act for Maryland) Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0769 /CH0365 Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1134) Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 (HJ0009) Exposure of Minors to Pornography - Degradation of Public Health Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM