Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pornography -see also- Nudity and Sexual Displays; Obscenity

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Juveniles – Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB1058)
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Child Pornography - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Child Pornography - Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245
Title
Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Distribution, Creation, or Possession by Minor Subject
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1058 (HB0623)
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Child Pornography - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Juveniles – Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 (SB1058) Criminal Law - Possession of Child Pornography - Penalty Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0370 (SB0385/CH0371) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 370
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0931 Criminal Law - Distribution of Child Pornography - Minor Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 Juvenile Law - Conduct by Children Involving Sexually Explicit or Nude Images Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Distribution, Creation, or Possession by Minor Subject Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1058 (HB0623) Criminal Law - Possession of Child Pornography - Penalty Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:16 PM