Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 (SB1096)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0040 (HB0285)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096 (HB1539)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014 Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1539 (SB1096) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0152 /CH0040 (HB0285) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 (HB1539) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM