Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0148)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0062)
Title
Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027
Title
Department of Transportation - Heads of Business Units - Appointment and Senate Confirmation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB0148) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1410 (SB0062) Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 Industrial Partnerships - Sustainable Materials Management Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB1027 Department of Transportation - Heads of Business Units - Appointment and Senate Confirmation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2020 1:41 PM