Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power of Attorney

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0429)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0531)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0531 (SB0429) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0429 (HB0531) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM