Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power of Attorney

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0015)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB1484)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365)
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 /CH0365 (SB0239/CH0364) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1484 (SB0015) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0015 (HB1484) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0364 (HB0507/CH0365) Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM