Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power of Attorney

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0803)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB0675)
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0864)
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB0849)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0849 (SB0803) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act) Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0864 (SB0675) Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0675 (HB0864) Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0803 (HB0849) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM