Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0435 (SB0027/CH0434)
Title
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant Project
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187)
Title
Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0385 /CH0435 (SB0027/CH0434) Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 (SB0887/CH0572) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1451 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant Project Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0887 /CH0572 (HB1187) Public Utilities - Solar Photovoltaic Systems Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM