Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899
Title
Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0378 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0656 Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control Technologies Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0899 Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM