Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM