Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 /CH0382 (SB0715)
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0773/CH0382)
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1592)
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0773 /CH0382 (SB0715) Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 (HB0773/CH0382) Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0931 (HB1592) Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive Plan Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM