Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0265)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531 (SB0656)
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB0739)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1545 (SB0887)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0363)
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0531)
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1426)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 (HB1545)
Title
Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0363 (SB0265) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 (SB0656) Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1426 (SB0739) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1545 (SB0887) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 (HB0363) Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0531) Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0739 (HB1426) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0887 (HB1545) Electric Generation - Transition From Fossil Fuels - Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Account Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1032 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 6:50 PM