Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Personal Protective Equipment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124
Title
Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 (SB0570)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983
Title
Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 (SB0563)
Title
Local Health Departments – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 (HB1123)
Title
Local Health Departments - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0737)
Title
Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Public Safety - Emergency Powers Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0124 Occupational Safety and Health Standards to Protect Employees - Aerosol Transmissible Diseases and COVID-19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0577 Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0737 (SB0570) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0983 Nursing Homes - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation (The Gloria Daytz Lewis Act) Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 (SB0563) Local Health Departments – Funding Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 (HB1123) Local Health Departments - Funding Senator Griffith 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0570 (HB0737) Emergency Services – Exposure to Contagious Diseases and Viruses – Notification and Other Requirements President 3 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:07 PM
Click to return on the top page