Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pregnancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid Center
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 /CH0619
Title
Adoption - Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1299
Title
Lead Poisoning - Risk Reduction Standard - Frequency of Testing
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0456)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB1312)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802
Title
Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid Center Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0563 /CH0619 Adoption - Payment of Expenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0829 Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint Restrictions Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1299 Lead Poisoning - Risk Reduction Standard - Frequency of Testing Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1312 (SB0456) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Appropriations
HB1335 Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - Requirement Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1471 Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death Certificates Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0114 Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0456 (HB1312) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM