Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pregnancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0034)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0798)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0283)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0792)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1337)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944
Title
Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0034) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0792 (SB0695) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 (SB0798) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0034 (HB0283) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0695 (HB0792) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0798 (HB1337) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0944 Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM