Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pregnancy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 /CH0668
Title
Public Health - Prenatal HIV Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0729 (SB0232)
Title
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0221 (SB0600/CH0222)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 (SB1015)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167 (SB0841)
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1643
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 (HB0616/CH0729)
Title
Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0222 (HB0775/CH0221)
Title
Public Health - Maternal Mental Health
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB1167)
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1015 (HB1001)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0214 Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 /CH0668 Public Health - Prenatal HIV Testing Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0729 (SB0232) Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0775 /CH0221 (SB0600/CH0222) Public Health - Maternal Mental Health Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1001 (SB1015) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1167 (SB0841) Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017 Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1223 Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1643 Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0232 (HB0616/CH0729) Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy Senator Manno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0222 (HB0775/CH0221) Public Health - Maternal Mental Health Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB1167) Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1015 (HB1001) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM