Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 (SB0720)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 /CH0622 (SB0419)
Title
Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show Cause
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0454)
Title
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109
Title
Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0556)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0596/CH0622)
Title
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0848)
Title
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB1112)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 (HB0476)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 (SB0720) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0596 /CH0622 (SB0419) Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show Cause Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0848 (SB0454) Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk Assessment Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0556) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0419 (HB0596/CH0622) Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 (HB0848) Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 (HB1112) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0720 (HB0476) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM