Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0182)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No-Bail Status - Comprehensive Evidence-Based Risk Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003
Title
Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0973)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294 (SB0757)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 (HB0382)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0029)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 (HB1294)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 (HB1232)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 (SB0554) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 (SB0182) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No-Bail Status - Comprehensive Evidence-Based Risk Assessment Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act) Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1232 (SB0973) Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1294 (SB0757) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 (HB0382) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0029) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 (HB1294) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 (HB1232) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM