Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0616
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269
Title
Pretrial Release, Parole, and Probation - Marijuana - Urinalyses
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268 /CH0506
Title
Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0616 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Out-of-State Sex Offenders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0196 Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0269 Pretrial Release, Parole, and Probation - Marijuana - Urinalyses Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1046 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1268 /CH0506 Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1516 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 Criminal Law - First Degree Murder - Sentencing (Geraldine's Law) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM