Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0879)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215 (SB0983)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Criteria
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Baltimore City - Nonviolent Offenders - Release Without Bail
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 (SB0880)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574 /CH0457
Title
Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 305-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Victim Protection
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 (HB1157)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB1390)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 (HB1215)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0325 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0879) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 /CH0643 (SB0976) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1215 (SB0983) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1280 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Criteria Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 Baltimore City - Nonviolent Offenders - Release Without Bail Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 (SB0880) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1574 /CH0457 Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 305-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Victim Protection Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 (HB1157) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and Conditions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 (HB1390) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0933 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Presentment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB1163/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release - Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law) Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0983 (HB1215) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM