Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0741
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 /CH0608
Title
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 /CH0427 (SB0170/CH0428)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0484)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128 (SB0736)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Defendant on Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1520 (SB0766)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1757 (SB1124)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 /CH0428 (HB0388/CH0427)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0480)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 (HB1128)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1520)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1081)
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1757)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0065 Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring - Pretrial Release and Probation Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0110 /CH0741 St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 /CH0608 Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 /CH0427 (SB0170/CH0428) Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0480 (SB0484) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Grace Period for Failure to Appear Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 (SB0736) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Defendant on Parole Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1520 (SB0766) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1757 (SB1124) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0170 /CH0428 (HB0388/CH0427) Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 (HB0480) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Fees Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention Programs Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 (HB1128) Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1520) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1081) Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1757) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM