Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0045 (SB0130/CH0046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 (SB0551)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0932)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0138/CH0049)
Title
Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0809/CH0324)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Urinalyses, Civil Offense Threshold, and Evidence Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0789)
Title
Involuntary Commitment - Procedures for Admission
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0152
Title
Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0046 (HB0121/CH0045)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0049 (HB0667)
Title
Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0389
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0263)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1204)
Title
Involuntary Commitment - Procedures for Admission
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532)
Title
Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 /CH0532 (SB0846) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB0121 /CH0045 (SB0130/CH0046) Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0263 (SB0551) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0566 (SB0932) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 (SB0138/CH0049) Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0745 (SB0809/CH0324) Correctional Facilities - Restrictive Housing - Pregnant Inmates Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0875 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Urinalyses, Civil Offense Threshold, and Evidence Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 (SB0789) Involuntary Commitment - Procedures for Admission Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1406 /CH0152 Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0046 (HB0121/CH0045) Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0138 /CH0049 (HB0667) Stalking – Violation of Conditions of Release Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0389 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0408 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0263) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1204) Involuntary Commitment - Procedures for Admission Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 (HB0116/CH0532) Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0932 (HB0566) Criminal Procedure - Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM