Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prisoners -see also- Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038
Title
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0490
Title
Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum Sentences
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0414)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0111)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0366)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622 (SB0603)
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional Parole
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 /CH0450
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 (SB0340)
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1000 (SB0583/CH0369)
Title
DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 (HB0303)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and Sentencing
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336
Title
Correctional Services - Elderly Inmates - Compassionate Release
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 (HB0980)
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0337)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0301)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0369 (HB1000)
Title
DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 (HB0622)
Title
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional Parole
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Incarcerated Employees
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0038 Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and Sentencing Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 /CH0490 Criminal Procedure - Drug-Related Offenses - Departure From Mandatory Minimum Sentences Delegate Anderson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0414) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0303 (SB0111) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 (SB0366) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 (SB0603) Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional Parole Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 /CH0450 Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0980 (SB0340) Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons Delegate McCray 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1000 (SB0583/CH0369) DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1001 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Return of Defendant Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 (HB0303) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and Sentencing Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 Correctional Services - Elderly Inmates - Compassionate Release Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 (HB0980) Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons Senator Conway 2 2 Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 4/8/2016
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0337) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0301) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Incapacity Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0583 /CH0369 (HB1000) DNA Evidence - Postconviction Review Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0603 (HB0622) Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional Parole Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Incarcerated Employees Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM