Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prisoners -see also- Ex-Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0531)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 (SB0433)
Title
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill Inmates
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0597 (SB0946/CH0596)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447 (SB0032)
Title
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB1447)
Title
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044
Title
Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121
Title
Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 (HB0906)
Title
Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0882)
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0596 (HB1180/CH0597)
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0882 (SB0531) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 (SB0433) Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill Inmates Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 /CH0597 (SB0946/CH0596) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1195 Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional Education Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea Agreements Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1447 (SB0032) State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0032 (HB1447) State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 Seat Belts - Operation of Motor Vehicle While Inmate or Person in Custody Unrestrained - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0433 (HB0906) Correctional Services - Special Requirements for Elderly, Chronically Ill, and Terminally Ill Inmates Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0882) Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0946 /CH0596 (HB1180/CH0597) Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1111 Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM